|
25.06.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
34 |
|
23.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.02.2021 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.01.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.01.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
10.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
10.09.2020 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2020 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.07.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.08.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.07.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
35 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.10.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
24.06.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.02.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.07.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
08.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.12.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
16.12.2010 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |