EP2446145 - METHOD OF CONVERTING LIQUID RING PUMPS HAVING SEALING LIQUID VENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gardner Denver Nash LLC 9 Trefoil Drive Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISSELL, Douglas, Eric 6 Toll Gate Road Monroe CT 06468 / US | 02 /
BEERS, Charles, Howard 50 Hilltop Circle Milford CT 06460 / US | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10792501.8 | 02.06.2010 | WO2010US37080 | Priority number, date | US20090220904P | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 220904 P | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010151405 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446145 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F04C19/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
F04C19/008 (EP,KR,US);
F04C19/005 (KR,US);
F04B7/06 (KR);
F04C2220/20 (EP,KR,US);
F04C2230/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49238 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49716 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON FLÜSSIGRINGPUMPEN MIT ABDICHTENDEN FLÜSSIGKEITSLUFTLÖCHERN | [2012/18] | English: | METHOD OF CONVERTING LIQUID RING PUMPS HAVING SEALING LIQUID VENTS | [2012/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE POMPES À ANNEAU LIQUIDE COMPRENANT DES ÉVENTS POUR LIQUIDE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 04.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4498844 (BISSELL DOUGLAS E [US], et al) [X] 10-14 * column 5, line 38 - column 8, line 40; figures 4,10-14 * [A] 1-9; | [X]US5356268 (LENGYEL LOUIS J [US], et al) [X] 10,12 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 55; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1892419 (GARDNER DENVER NASH LLC [US]) [X] 10,12 * paragraph [0033]; figures 2-7 *; | [X]US4551070 (OLSEN OLE B [US], et al) [X] 10 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-5 * | International search | [Y]US4498844 (BISSELL DOUGLAS E [US], et al); | [Y]US4565498 (SCHMID NORBERT [DE], et al); | [A]US2008038120 (LENGYEL LOUIS [US], et al); | [A]US4613283 (HAAVIK HAROLD K [US]); | [A]US4850808 (SCHULTZE WALTER J [US], et al); | [A]GB522964 (IRVING CALLENDER JENNINGS) | by applicant | US4498844 | US4850808 |