EP2513151 - CASSIA DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEPILLEUR, Carole, A. 560 Lake of the Woods Blvd. Akron Ohio 44141-3247 / US | 02 /
MALABA, Dennis 4106 Southwyck Road Uniontown Ohio 44685 / US | 03 /
MULLAY, John, J. 9251 Lori Jean Drive Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | 04 /
RAFFERTY, Denise, W. 350 Meadowview Drive Sagamore Hills Ohio 44067 / US | 05 /
ANDERSON, Eric, Hugo 17413 Oxford Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44111-4034 / US | 06 /
LIU, Xin Room 403 66 Yan Ji Qi Cun Shanghai 200093 / CN | 07 /
MILLER, Cory, G. 337 Dartmouth Trail Sagamore Hills Ohio 44067 / US | 08 /
KRZYSIK, Duane, G. 2544 Cedarwood Court Hudson Ohio 44236 / US | 09 /
KOLP, Christopher, D. 984 Woodlane Drive Mayfield Village Ohio 44236 / US | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2012/43] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10798664.8 | 14.12.2010 | WO2010US60214 | Priority number, date | US20090286039P | 14.12.2009 Original published format: US 286039 P | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011081907 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2513151 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2513151 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C08L5/00, A61K8/73, A61Q5/06 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C08B37/0087 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KASSIEDERIVATE | [2012/43] | English: | CASSIA DERIVATIVES | [2012/43] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE CASSIA | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2010 | AL | 10.09.2014 | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MK | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | NL | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | RS | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | SM | 10.09.2014 | NO | 10.12.2014 | GR | 11.12.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MK | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/51] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
NL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RS | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
GR | 11.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004112733 (NOVEON IP HOLDINGS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0046]; claim - *; | [X]US2007292380 (STAUDIGEL JAMES ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1-46 * example -; claim - *; | [IA]EP0496584 (STEIN HALL & CO INC [US]) [I] 1-13 * example -; claim - * * page 3, line 1 - line 3 * [A] 14-46 | by applicant | US4753659 | WO2004112733 | US2007292380 | EP0496584 | US7262157 | US5733854 | US6197317 | US34584 | US5104646 | US5106609 | US4152416 | US2826551 | US3964500 | US4364837 | GB849433 | EP0582152 | WO9323009 | US5136063 | US5180843 | EP0486135 | WO9311103 | US5087445 | US4509949 | US2798053 | US5288814 | US3657175 | US4384096 | US4464524 | US4801671 | US5292843 | US7378479 | US7205271 | - International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary, PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (FORMALLY THE COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION | - Cosmetic Bench Reference, ALLURED PUBLISHING CORPORATION, (2001), vol. 115 | - INCI Dictionary, vol. 2 | - Surface Active Agents and Detergents, INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1958), vol. II | - "Polymer Encyclopedia", Cosmetics & Toiletries@, ALLURED PUBLISHING CORPORATION, (200212), vol. 117 | - WHALLEY, "Fabric Conditioning Agents", HAPPI, (199502), pages 55 - 58 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1989), vol. 15, pages 204 - 308 | - TODD; BYERS, "Volatile Silicone Fluids for Cosmetics", COSMETICS AND TOILETRIES, (1976), vol. 91, no. 1, pages 27 - 32 | - KASPRZAK, "Volatile Silicones", SOAP/COSMETICS/CHEMICAL SPECIALITIES, (198612), pages 40 - 43 | - "Alkali-Swellable and Alkali-Soluble Thickener Technology A Review", GREGORY D. SHAY, Polymers in Aqueous Media - Performance Through Association, Advances in Chemistry Series 223, DIVISION POLYMERIC MATERIALS, (1989), pages 457 - 494 | - ENGLYST ET AL., "Determination of Dietary Fibre as Non-Starch Polysaccharides by Gas-Liquid Chromatography", ANALYST, (199211), pages 1707 - 1714 | - K. L. HODGES; W. E. KESTER; D. L. WIEDERRICH; J. A. GROVER, "Determination of Alkoxyl Substitution in Cellulose Ethers by Zeisel-Gas Chromatography", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (197911), vol. 51, no. 13, pages 2172 - 2176 | - Harry's Cosmeticology, CHEMICAL PUBLISHING CO., INC., (2000), pages 666 - 667 | - DIAZ ET AL., J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (198307), vol. 34, pages 205 - 212 |