|
22.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
20.01.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2015 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2011 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
17 |