EP2380228 - CATALYTIC ELECTRODE WITH GRADIENT POROSITY AND CATALYST DENSITY FOR FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Florida State University Research Foundation, Inc. 2010 Levy Avenue, Suite 276-C Tallahassee FL 32306 / US | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Jian-Ping 46375 Mallard Trace Drive Tallahassee FL 32312 / US | 02 /
LIANG, Zhiyong 4110 Kipling Court Tallahassee FL 32311 / US | 03 /
WANG, Ben 2525 Pottsdamer Street Tallahassee FL 32310 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Chun 2525 Pottsdamer Street Tallahassee FL 32310 / US | 05 /
ZHU, Wei 166 Crenshaw Drive Apt. 1 Tallahassee FL 32310 / US | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/37] |
Former [2011/43] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10800665.1 | 19.07.2010 | WO2010US42451 | Priority number, date | US20100320639P | 02.04.2010 Original published format: US 320639 P | US20090505070 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: US 505070 | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011009124 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2380228 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2380228 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/90, H01M8/10, H01M4/88, B82B3/00, B01J23/00, H01M4/86, H01M4/92, H01M8/02 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
H01M4/8642 (EP,US);
H01M4/90 (KR);
B01J23/00 (KR);
B82B3/00 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H01M4/8657 (EP,US);
H01M4/88 (KR);
H01M4/8892 (EP,US);
H01M4/92 (EP,US);
H01M4/926 (EP,US);
H01M8/0234 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5288 (EP,US);
H01M4/8807 (EP,US);
H01M8/0245 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | H01M4/90, H01M8/10, H01M4/88, B82B3/00, B01J23/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHE ELEKTRODE MIT GESTEIGERTER POROSITÄT UND KATALYSATORDICHTE FÜR BRENNSTOFFZELLEN | [2011/43] | English: | CATALYTIC ELECTRODE WITH GRADIENT POROSITY AND CATALYST DENSITY FOR FUEL CELLS | [2011/43] | French: | ELECTRODE CATALYTIQUE AYANT UN GRADIENT DE POROSITÉ ET UNE DENSITÉ DE CATALYSEUR POUR PILES À COMBUSTIBLE | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 27.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2010 | AL | 10.09.2014 | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MC | 10.09.2014 | MK | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | SM | 10.09.2014 | TR | 10.09.2014 | IS | 10.01.2015 | PT | 12.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MK | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.07.2010 | |
AT | 10.09.2014 | ||
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
TR | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MC | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
PT | 12.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004197638 (MCELRATH KENNETH O [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0101] *; | [A]US2008115875 (JENG KING-TSAI [TW], et al) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0031] * | International search | [A]US6287717 (CAVALCA CARLOS A [US], et al); | [A]US2003118907 (SHIRAISHI MASASHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2008020261 (HENDRICKS SUSAN M [US], et al); | [A]US2009053577 (AOTANI KOICHIRO [JP]); | [X] - KU, CHUNG-LIN, "Nanotube Buckypaper Electrode for PEM Fuel Cell Application s", MS. THESIS, FLORIDA STAT E UNIVERSITY, (2007), XP008150922 |