EP2513709 - STABILIZED CONTACT LENSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2016/33] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERLIGAND, Pierre 224 N. Checkerberry Way St. Johns FL 32259 / US | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/14] |
Former [2012/43] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10801043.0 | 17.12.2010 | [2017/14] | WO2010US60999 | Priority number, date | US20090641144 | 17.12.2009 Original published format: US 641144 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011084681 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2513709 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2513709 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/04, G02C7/02 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
G02C7/048 (EP,KR,US);
G02C7/04 (KR);
G02C7/028 (EP,US);
G02C2202/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | G02C7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE KONTAKTLINSEN | [2012/43] | English: | STABILIZED CONTACT LENSES | [2012/43] | French: | LENTILLES DE CONTACT STABILISÉES | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 21.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 17.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2010 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | LU | 17.12.2017 | MT | 17.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 17.12.2017 | ||
MT | 17.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009225273 (CLUTTERBUCK TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,19,20 * paragraph [0018] * * figures 1, 3, 4, 7 *; | [XI]EP0866354 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 1,2,10,11,19,20 * page 2, line 3 - line 7 * * page 4, line 14 - line 18 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 6 * * figures 1-8 * [I] 2; | [XDI]US2005041202 (JUBIN PHILIPPE F [US], et al) [XD] 1-3,7,9,12,16,18 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0004] , [ 0013] , [ 0015] , [ 0038] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 4,8,13,17; | [XI]WO2004010204 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9,12,16 * page 5, line 7 - line 22 * * figure 2 * [I] 4-6,8,13-15,17,18; | [A]US2006055884 (MOLINARI JASON E [US], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0064] *; | [A]WO0175509 (OCULAR SCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 15, line 10 - line 29 * * figure 3 * | [A] - GRANT R, "Mechanics of Toric Soft lens Stabilization", JOURNAL OF THE BRITISH CONTACT LENS ASSOCIATION, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 9, no. Supplement 1, doi:DOI::10.1016/S0141-7037(86)80023-4, ISSN 0141-7037, (19860101), pages 44 - 47, (20060920), XP007917345 [A] 1-11 * page 44 - page 45 * * page 46, column 1, line 30 - line 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/:10.1016/S0141-7037(86)80023-4 | Examination | US5100225 | by applicant | US2005237482 | US5652638 | US5805260 | US6183082 | US6305802 | US6554425 | US5371147 | US5314960 | US5057578 | US5540410 |