EP2477433 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RADIO BASE STATION, RADIO RELAY STATION, AND HANDOVER CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAJI, Mitsuhiro c/o KYOCERA Corporation Yokohama Office 1-1 Kagahara 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8502 / JP | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10815431.1 | 09.09.2010 | WO2010JP65559 | Priority number, date | JP20090208423 | 09.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009208423 | [2012/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011030836 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2477433 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/26, H04B7/15, H04W28/08, H04W36/08, H04W36/22 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
H04W36/22 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/155 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0942 (KR);
H04W36/30 (KR);
H04W36/38 (KR);
H04W84/047 (EP,KR,US);
H04W88/08 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, FUNKBASISSTATION, RADIORELAISSTATION UND WEITERLEITUNGSSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2012/29] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, RADIO BASE STATION, RADIO RELAY STATION, AND HANDOVER CONTROL METHOD | [2012/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, STATION DE BASE RADIO, STATION RELAIS RADIO ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2012 | Translation filed | 14.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 04.08.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2001128208 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A] - HUAWEI, "Mobile relay support analysis", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING #67, R2-094777, (20090824), XP050352806 | by applicant | JP2009208423 |