EP2483856 - USER PREFERENCE SURVEYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luvitorshuvit Limited Level 1 14 Penrose Road Penrose, Auckland 1060 / NZ | [2012/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMES, Russell, Eric 10 Faulder Avenue Westemere, Auckland 1022 / NZ | 02 /
ROBSON, Glenn, Linley 18 Kohia Terrace Epsom, Auckland 1023 / NZ | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2012/32] | Application number, filing date | 10820882.8 | 28.09.2010 | WO2010NZ00190 | Priority number, date | NZ20090580050 | 29.09.2009 Original published format: NZ 58005009 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011040822 | Date: | 07.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2483856 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Title | German: | BENUTZERPRÄFERENZERMITTLUNGEN | [2012/32] | English: | USER PREFERENCE SURVEYS | [2012/32] | French: | ETUDES DE PRÉFÉRENCE UTILISATEUR | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 10.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2013 | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-11 * The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | International search | [X]US2009075738 (PEARCE NATHAN [US]); | [X]US2007282791 (AMZALAG BENNY [IL], et al); | [A]US2008104172 (CRAIG TERRANCE MICHAEL [CA]); | [A]US7337127 (SMITH LINDA M [US], et al); | [A]WO0146887 (MY E SURVEYS COM LLC [US]); | [A]WO0191348 (INTELLIBRIDGE CORP [US]); | [A]US2009138325 (BRITT JR JOE FREEMAN [US], et al) |