EP2519934 - METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS EMPLOYING SENSOR-EQUIPPED SMART PHONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digimarc Corporation 9405 S.W. Gemini Drive Beaverton, OR 97008 / US | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAYLOR, Mary, Elizabeth 1229 SE 34th Avenue Portland OR 97214 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Bruce, L. 15599 Village Drive Lake Oswego OR 97034 / US | 03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Tony, F. 4436 SW Eleanor Lane Portland OR 97221 / US | 04 /
RHOADS, Geoffrey, B. 26855 SW Campbell Lane West Linn OR 97068 / US | 05 /
CONWELL, William, Y. 6224 SW Tower Way Portland OR 97221 / US | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10841737.9 | 30.12.2010 | WO2010US62549 | Priority number, date | US20090291812P | 31.12.2009 Original published format: US 291812 P | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011082332 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519934 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, H04M1/725, // G06F17/30 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
H04M1/72454 (EP,US);
G06F16/50 (EP,US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G10L15/22 (US);
H04N23/66 (US);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1636 (EP,US);
G10L2015/223 (US);
H04M19/047 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
H04M2250/10 (EP,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,US);
H04M2250/52 (EP,US);
H04M2250/74 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | G08B1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN MIT SMARTPHONES MIT SENSOREN | [2012/45] | English: | METHODS AND ARRANGEMENTS EMPLOYING SENSOR-EQUIPPED SMART PHONES | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS EMPLOYANT DES TÉLÉPHONES INTELLIGENTS ÉQUIPÉS DE CAPTEURS | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 26.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.02.2018 | 27.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1320043 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0081] *; | [X]US2008248797 (FREEMAN DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0054] *; | [A]US2009167787 (BATHICHE STEVEN N [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0046] ** paragraph [0056] * | International search | [Y]US2003028380 (FREELAND WARWICK PETER [AU], et al); | [A]US2004169674 (LINJAMA JUKKA [FI]); | [X]US2006097983 (HAGGMAN KAJ [FI], et al); | [X]US2008136587 (ORR KEVIN [CA]); | [A]US2008165022 (HERZ SCOTT [US], et al) | by applicant | US2008248797 | US2010119208 | US2010205628 | US20090640386 |