EP2328022 - Photomask blank and photomask making method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/35] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshikawa, Hiroki c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
Inazuki, Yukio c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 03 /
Okazaki, Satoshi c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 04 /
Haraguchi, Takashi c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Saga, Tadashi c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Kojima, Yosuke c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Fukushima, Yuichi c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/35] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
Yoshikawa, Hiroki c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Inazuki, Yukio c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Okazaki, Satoshi c/o New Functional Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Haraguchi, Takashi c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Saga, Tadashi c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Kojima, Yosuke c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
07 /
Fukushima, Yuichi c/o Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/35] |
Former [2011/22] | Bailey, Sam Rogerson, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11000880.2 | 12.03.2007 | [2011/22] | Priority number, date | JP20060065763 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006065763 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2328022 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2328022 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
G03F1/32 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/54 (EP,KR,US);
C23F4/00 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/30 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/46 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/62 (KR);
G03F1/80 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0332 (KR);
H01L21/0337 (KR);
Y10T428/31616 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/35] |
Former [2011/22] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Fotomaskenrohling und Herstellungsverfahren für eine Fotomaske | [2011/22] | English: | Photomask blank and photomask making method | [2011/22] | French: | Ébauche de photomasque et procédé de fabrication d'un photomasque | [2011/22] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07251015.9 / EP1832926 | Divisional application(s) | EP16179566.1 / EP3118681 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070251015) is 04.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6037083 (MITSUI MASARU [JP]) [A] 1-24 * column 6, lines 37-45 ** column 12, lines 29-33 *; | [Y]US6395433 (SMITH BRUCE W [US]) [Y] 1-24 * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 8 * * figure 1 * * column 4, lines 3-8 * * column 4, lines 16,17 * * column 3, lines 23-27 * * column 4, lines 3-12 * * column 9, lines 1-9 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 22 * * column 6, lines 10,11 * * claim 8 *; | [Y]US6472107 (CHAN DAVID Y [US]) [Y] 1-24 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 14 * * column 6, lines 7-14 * * figure 5 * * column 4, lines 7-9 *; | [A]US2003180631 (SHIOTA YUUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0091] - [0095]; figure 3; table 5 * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraphs [0141] , [0142] * * paragraphs [0112] , [0116] , [0139] , [0060] * * paragraphs [0074] - [0076] * | Examination | JPH0695358 | by applicant | JPS6385553 | JPH01142637 | JPH03116147 | JPH04246649 | JPH07140635 | JP3093632B | JP2001312043 | JP2003195479 | JP2003195483 |