EP2386904 - Method for computed radiography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/46] | Method and system for computed radiography | ||
[2023/30] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carestream Dental LLC 3625 Cumberland Boulevard, Suite 700 Atlanta, GA 30339 / US | [2023/27] |
Former [2020/25] | For all designated states Carestream Dental Technology Topco Limited Cleveland House 33 King Street London SW1Y 6RJ / GB | ||
Former [2018/03] | For all designated states Carestream Dental Technology Topco Limited Cleveland House 33King Street London SW1Y 6RJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Carestream Health, Inc. 150 Verona Street Rochester, NY 14608-1733 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Amir 33 A Vizman Street Kiryat Bialik / IL | 02 /
Ehrmann, Bruno 37 ruh de la Liberte 92150 Suresnes / FR | 03 /
Wigderson, Oded Wingate Street 18/5 Haifa 33533 / IL | 04 /
Teif, Dmitry Kibuz Galuot 25a PO Box 7033 Nesher 36610 / IL | 05 /
Inglese, Jean Marc 5 allee de chez Swan 77437 Bussy Saint Georges / FR | [2011/46] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2011/46] | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11003996.3 | 13.05.2011 | [2011/46] | Priority number, date | US20100334331P | 13.05.2010 Original published format: US 334331 P | US20100976011 | 22.12.2010 Original published format: US 976011 | [2011/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2386904 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2386904 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2386904 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/14, A61B6/00, G03B42/04 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A61B6/4411 (EP,US);
A61B6/512 (EP,KR,US);
G06K7/10376 (KR,US);
A61B6/4283 (KR);
A61B6/4494 (EP,KR,US);
A61B6/563 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | G03B42/04, A61B6/14, G01T1/29, G06K7/08, G06K19/077 | ||
Former IPC [2011/46] | G03B42/04, A61B6/14, G01T1/29, G06F17/30, G06K7/08, G06K19/077 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] |
Former [2011/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Computerunterstütztes Radiographieverfahren | [2023/30] | English: | Method for computed radiography | [2023/30] | French: | Procédé de radiographie assistée par ordinateur | [2023/30] |
Former [2011/46] | Computerunterstütztes Radiographieverfahren und -system | ||
Former [2011/46] | Method and system for computed radiography | ||
Former [2011/46] | Procédé et système de radiographie assistée par ordinateur | Examination procedure | 16.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.05.2020 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2021
Dürr Dental SE Höpfigheimer Strasse 17 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.03.2021
Dürr Dental SE Höpfigheimer Strasse 17 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 01.04.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.10.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.01.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.06.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.07.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.03.2023 | Appeal received No. T0549/23 | 15.03.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 01.06.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2011 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | FI | 13.05.2021 | GB | 13.05.2021 | IE | 13.05.2021 | LU | 13.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2021 | ||
GB | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2021 | ||
GB | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2021 | ||
GB | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2021 | ||
IE | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2021 | ||
LU | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY]US4960994 (MUELLER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [ID] 11,12 * column 4, line 32 - column 10, line 12; figures 1-5; claims 1-4,10-16 * [Y] 1-3,5-9; | [IDY]US5757021 (DEWAELE PIET [BE]) [ID] 14,15 * column 11, line 9 - column 13, line 25; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-3,5-9,11,12; | [ID]US6359628 (BUYTAERT TOM [BE]) [ID] 1-3,5-9,11,12,14,15* column 4, line 52 - column 9, line 21; figures 1-5 *; | [XDI]US7095034 (HAUG WERNER [DE], et al) [XD] 11,13 * column 4, line 13 - column 13, line 21; figures 1-3 * [I] 1-6,8-10,12,14,15; | [Y]US2006219964 (MOCHIZUKI NAOKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-6,8-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0083]; figures 1-9 *; | [I]US2006261296 (HEATH MICHAEL D [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0096]; figures 1-6 *; | [YD]US7319396 (HOMANFAR RAMIN [US], et al) [YD] 1,4-6,8-15 * column 14, line 17 - column 15, line 22; figures 1-4 * * column 32, line 7 - column 33, line 12; figures 8-10 *; | US7518518 [ ] (HOMANFAR RAMIN [US], et al) | by applicant | US4739480 | US4960994 | US5418355 | US5428659 | EP0727696 | US5757021 | US6359628 | US6381416 | US7095034 | US7211785 | US7319396 | US7518518 | Opposition | US4960994 | US5757021 | EP0908762 | US6359628 | EP1517175 | JP2005107346 | EP1544672 | US7095034 | US2006219964 | US2006261296 | US7319396 | JP2008015249 | JP2009080032 | US2010061616 | JP4585331B | - Anonymous, "TagCoder lite", Sokymat Automotive - Product Information, (2007), XP055792800 | - Anonymous, "1. Datenstruktur des RFID-Tags", Dürr Dental, (20090320), pages 1 - 3, XP055792805 | - anonymous, "Med Scan Reader Module 2133-655-50", Sokymat Automotive - Product Specification 800 013 Version 1.1, (20070828), pages 1 - 14, XP055792796 | - Anonymous, "HD-CR 43 NDT / CR 43 NDT", Dürr NDT - Manual, (20091208), pages 1 - 32, XP055792807 | - anonymous, "Montage- and Gebrauchsanweisung CR 43 VET", Dürr NDT, (20091103), pages 1 - 28, XP055792792 |