|
17.12.2021 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2021 |
Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2021 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.07.2021 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2020 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2020 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.02.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.12.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.11.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.11.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
14 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.02.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.07.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
44 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.05.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2011 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |