EP2390862 - Method for controlling the operation of a fully automatic driver assistance system of a motor vehicle for independent vehicle guidance and motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | |||
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states Volkswagen AG 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörwick, Markus Maria-Einsiedel-Str. 9 81379 München / DE | 02 /
Siedersberger, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Wolfgang-Höfer-Strasse 13 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | 03 /
Prosser, Thomas Amselweg 9 83052 Bruckmühl / DE | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Thielmann, Frank AUDI AG Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | Thielmann, Frank AUDI AG, Patentabteilung 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 11004224.9 | 23.05.2011 | [2011/48] | Priority number, date | DE20101021591 | 26.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010021591 | [2011/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2390862 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2390862 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60W30/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
B60W50/0205 (EP);
G08G1/166 (EP);
G08G1/22 (EP);
B60W2050/0292 (EP);
B60W2050/0295 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/48] | G08G1/16, B60K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung des Betriebs eines vollautomatischen, zur unabhängigen Fahrzeugführung ausgebildeten Fahrerassistenzsystems eines Kraftfahrzeugs und Kraftfahrzeug | [2011/48] | English: | Method for controlling the operation of a fully automatic driver assistance system of a motor vehicle for independent vehicle guidance and motor vehicle | [2011/48] | French: | Procédé de commande du fonctionnement d'un système d'assistance au conducteur totalement automatique développé pour guider un véhicule de manière indépendante destiné à un véhicule automobile et véhicule automobile | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2019 | 14.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/42] | 10.06.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/42] | Divisional application(s) | EP19187687.9 / EP3599597 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0913751 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * [Y] 6-12; | [XY]DE10027168 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,13 * abstract * * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 11 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 9 * * column 9, line 46 - line 60 * * column 10, line 5 - line 30 * [Y] 6-12; | [A]EP1405752 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] ** paragraph [0046]; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE102009050399 |