EP2431851 - Mobile terminal and method for controlling operation of the mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jinsool c/o LG Electronics Inc. 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Dongok c/o LG Electronics Inc. 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Taeyun c/o LG Electronics Inc. 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | 04 /
Seen, Seungmin c/o LG Electronics Inc. 327-23 Gasan-dong Geumchun-ku Seoul 153-023 / KR | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Mauerkircherstraße 45 DE-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/12] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstraße 45 DE-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11007193.3 | 05.09.2011 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | KR20100090761 | 15.09.2010 Original published format: KR 20100090761 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2431851 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2431851 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/01 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G06F3/017 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
G06F3/011 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
G06F3/04812 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2012/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Betriebs des mobilen Endgeräts | [2012/12] | English: | Mobile terminal and method for controlling operation of the mobile terminal | [2012/12] | French: | Terminal mobile et procédé de commande du fonctionnement du terminal mobile | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 24.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2018 | 25.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/47] | 13.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009035705 (REACTRIX SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-15 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0079]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086]; figures 6,7 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0094] * [I] 8-10; | [XI]EP0837418 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * page 17, line 44 - page 20, line 39 * * page 27, line 43 - line 50 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]US2009315740 (HILDRETH EVAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,11-15 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0111]; figures 9-13 * [I] 8-10 | by applicant | KR20100090761 |