EP2345878 - User interface system and method for diagnosing a rotating machine condition not based upon prior measurement history [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluke Corporation 6920 Seaway Boulevard Everett, WA 98203 / US | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hudson, Eric 19607 Knoll Drive Arlington, WA 98223 / US | 02 /
Namli, Demet 12022B 28th Avenue NE Seattle, WA 98125 / US | 03 /
Peterson, Rand 10725 56th Ave W Mukilteo, WA 98275 / US | 04 /
Ferrante, Joseph 13315 NE 69th Way Redmond, WA 68052 / US | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Lunt, Mark George Francis Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11151052.5 | 14.01.2011 | [2011/29] | Priority number, date | US20100688736 | 15.01.2010 Original published format: US 688736 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2345878 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2345878 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01H1/00, G01M13/02 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
G01M99/005 (EP,US);
G01H1/003 (EP,US);
G01M13/028 (EP,US);
G01M13/045 (EP,US);
G05B23/0245 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | G01H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2011/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Benutzerschnittstellensystem und Verfahren zur Diagnose eines Drehmaschinenzustands, der nicht auf dem vorherigen Messverlauf basiert | [2011/29] | English: | User interface system and method for diagnosing a rotating machine condition not based upon prior measurement history | [2011/29] | French: | Système d'interface utilisateur et procédé pour le diagnostic de l'état d'une machine rotative ne se basant pas sur un historique de mesures préalables | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 31.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2021 | 07.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/06] | 30.09.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009292505 (VAN DYKE DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0020] , [0023] , [0025] , [0028] - [0031] - [0033] - [0060] - [0063] , [0068] , [0083] - [0086] * [Y] 5,6 [I] 4,7; | [XYI]US2001001851 (PIETY KENNETH R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,11-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0011] , [0019] , [0076] , [0077] , [0087] - [0091] - [0110] - [0141] - [0225] , [0226] * [Y] 5,6 [I] 7,10; | [Y]US2003028269 (SPRIGGS BOB [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0091] - [0097] * | by applicant | US20080324682 |