EP2325398 - A system and method of extending piles into a seabed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kværner Jacket Technology AS Postboks 74 1326 Lysaker / NO | [2012/13] |
Former [2011/21] | For all designated states Aker Jacket Technology AS P.O. Box 222 1326 Lysaker / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alm, Torstein Sognsvannsvn. 28D 0372 Oslo / NO | [2011/21] | Representative(s) | Onsagers AS P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2011/21] | Onsagers AS Universitetsgaten 7 P.O. Box 6963 St. Olavs plass 0130 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 11153383.2 | 28.09.2010 | [2011/21] | Priority number, date | NO20090003082 | 01.10.2009 Original published format: NO 20093082 | [2011/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2325398 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E02D13/04 | [2011/21] | CPC: |
E02D13/00 (EP);
E02D13/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Erstellung von Gründungspfählen auf einer Gewässersohle | [2011/21] | English: | A system and method of extending piles into a seabed | [2011/21] | French: | Système et procédé d'extension de piliers au fond de la mer | [2011/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 08.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10180777.4 / EP2309063 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100180777) is 07.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2054710 (CJB BEARL & WRIGHT LTD) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]NL1029056C (BREEJEN PIETER DEN [NL]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AP]GB2460172 (MARINE CURRENT TURBINES LTD [GB]) [AP] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AP]GB2467842 (MARINE CURRENT TURBINES LTD [GB]) [AP] 1-8 * the whole document * |