EP2345658 - Modified fluorinated nucleoside analogues [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Pharmasset LLC c/o Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Gilead Pharmasset LLC 303A College Road East Princeton, NJ 08450 / US | ||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Pharmasset, Inc. 303A College Road East Princeton, NJ 08450 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, Jeremy 2883 Quinbery Drive Snellville, GA 30039 / US | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Portal, Frédéric, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11157942.1 | 21.04.2004 | [2011/29] | Priority number, date | US20030474368P | 30.05.2003 Original published format: US 474368 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2345658 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/06, C07H19/16, C07H19/14, A61K31/7064, A61K31/7076, A61P31/12 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
C07H19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07H19/04 (EP,US);
C07H19/048 (EP,US);
C07H19/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07H19/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07H19/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/29] | Extension states | HR | 10.01.2012 | LT | 10.01.2012 | LV | 10.01.2012 | Title | German: | Modifizierte fluorinierte Nukleosidanaloga | [2011/29] | English: | Modified fluorinated nucleoside analogues | [2011/29] | French: | Analogues de nucléosides fluores modifiés | [2011/29] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 10.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2012 | Observations by third parties | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 30.04.2013 | Observations by third parties | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 11.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04775900.6 / EP1633766 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040775900) is 24.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO02057287 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US3798209 | USRE29835E | EP0180276 | WO8902733 | EP0350287 | WO9000555 | US4957924 | US5026687 | WO9116920 | WO9118914 | WO9119721 | US5149794 | US5157027 | WO9300910 | US5194654 | US5223263 | US5256641 | WO9426273 | US5372808 | US5411947 | WO9513090 | US5463092 | US5496546 | WO9615132 | US5538865 | US5543389 | US5543390 | US5543391 | US5554728 | JPH08268890 | US5610054 | WO9712033 | US5633358 | US5633388 | WO9736554 | US5676942 | US5711944 | US5725859 | US5738845 | US5738846 | JPH10101591 | WO9817679 | US5747646 | WO9822496 | US5792834 | US5830455 | US5830905 | US5834594 | US5837257 | US5846964 | US5849696 | US5869253 | WO9907734 | WO9915194 | US5891874 | US5908621 | WO9932139 | WO9932140 | US5922757 | US5928636 | US5942223 | WO9943691 | DE19914474 | US5980884 | US5990276 | WO9959621 | WO9964016 | US6004933 | WO0009531 | US6034134 | US6043077 | US6056961 | WO0024355 | WO0037110 | WO0132153 | WO0160315 | WO0179246 | WO0181359 | WO0190121 | WO0192282 | WO0196353 | WO0208251 | WO0208187 | WO0208256 | WO0208198 | US6348587 | WO0218404 | WO0232414 | WO0232920 | WO0248172 | WO0248157 | WO0248116 | WO0248165 | US6410531 | US6420380 | WO02057425 | WO02057287 | WO02060926 | US6534523 | WO03024461 | WO03105770 | WO2004002422 | WO2004002999 | WO2004007512 | WO2004009020 | other | WO2004002999 |