EP2505702 - Heald which comprises sections with multiple film layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerth, Christian, Dr. Beethovenstrasse 73 72458 Albstadt / DE | 02 /
Großmann, Rainer Hardtstrasse 9 72477 Schwenningen / DE | 03 /
Gusenko, Mario Lerchenstrasse 34 72458 Albstadt / DE | 04 /
Münster, Bernhard Auf Strangen 7 72469 Meßstetten / DE | 05 /
Fäller, Armin Ziegelstrasse 20 72459 Albstadt / DE | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/20] | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | ||
Former [2016/50] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2012/40] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11160055.7 | 28.03.2011 | [2012/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2505702 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2505702 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2505702 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D03C9/02, B21F45/08 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
D03C9/02 (EP,KR);
B21F45/08 (EP);
D03C9/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2012/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Weblitze mit einem abschnittsweise aus mehreren Folienlagen gebildeten Litzenkörper | [2012/40] | English: | Heald which comprises sections with multiple film layers | [2012/40] | French: | Lisse dotée d'un corps de lisse formé par sections de plusieurs couches de feuilles | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 28.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16165424.9 / EP3067448 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2017
ADMISSIBLE Gebrüder Klöcker GmbH Hauptstrasse 64 46325 Borken-Weseke / DE Opponent's representative Walther Bayer Faber Patentanwälte PartGmbB Heimradstraße 2 34130 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.07.2017
ADMISSIBLE Gebrüder Klöcker GmbH Hauptstrasse 64 46325 Borken-Weseke / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Walther Hinz Bayer PartGmbB Heimradstrasse 2 34130 Kassel / DE | 19.10.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.04.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 14.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.10.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.04.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2011 | AL | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | MT | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | AT | 28.03.2017 | GB | 28.03.2017 | IE | 28.03.2017 | LU | 28.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.03.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
AT | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.03.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
AT | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.03.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
AT | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
AT | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
AT | 28.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
GB | 28.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5005608 (ANDERSON LARRY D [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7,11 * column 2, lines 10-36; figures 1-11 * [A] 12-15[I] 2,4,5,8-10; | [XAI]EP1795636 (GROZ BECKERT KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0035]; figure 5 * [A] 12-15 [I] 2,4,5,8,9 | by applicant | CH601532 | US5348055 | DE4336362 | DE102005030632 | EP2224046 | Opposition | DE2519778 | CH601532 | US5005608 | US5348055 | DE4336362 | DE102005030632 | EP1795636 | EP2224046 |