EP2509037 - Payment processing system including mobile wireless communications device to send a payment confirmation to a transaction terminal and associated methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffin, Jason Tyler 295 Phillip Street Ext. 72251 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 02 /
Little, Herbert Anthony 295 Phillip Street Ext. 72223 Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Fennell, Gareth Charles Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Fennell, Gareth Charles Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11161682.7 | 08.04.2011 | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2509037 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/00 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
G06Q20/325 (EP);
G06Q20/202 (EP);
G06Q20/3276 (EP);
G06Q20/3278 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zahlungsbearbeitungssystem mit mobiler drahtloser Kommunikationsvorrichtung zum Senden einer Zahlungsbestätigung an einen Transaktionsterminal und zugehörige Verfahren | [2012/41] | English: | Payment processing system including mobile wireless communications device to send a payment confirmation to a transaction terminal and associated methods | [2012/41] | French: | Système de traitement de paiements incluant un dispositif de communications sans fil mobile pour envoyer une confirmation de paiement vers un terminal de transaction et procédés apparentés | [2012/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 19.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 21.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/09] | 09.10.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP17202903.5 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010320266 (WHITE SPENCER NEIL [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2008035148 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2088549 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES GMBH [CH]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0032] , [0033] - [0053] *; | [I]US2007108269 (BENCO DAVID S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1513120 (FUN COMM GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004105359 (ROSENBERG EINAR [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 10,12 * * paragraphs [0115] - [0116] *; | [A]EP2128809 (STALS LUC [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2008114088 (SKYPE LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 14 * * page 8, lines 13-20 *; | [A]WO2010019908 (VISA USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |