EP2361590 - Vascular protection devices and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group, LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | ||
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states EV3, Inc. 4600 Nathan Lane North Plymouth, MN 55442-2920 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Kent 11205 Virginia Avenue N Champlin, MN 55316 / US | 02 /
Oslund, John 12391 Goodhue Street NE Blaine, MN 55449 / US | 03 /
Kusleika, Richard 18188 Ullmann Circle Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | 04 /
Adams, Daniel 1145 Tonkawa Road Long Lake, MN 55356 / US | [2011/35] | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/37] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2011/35] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11163492.9 | 25.04.2003 | [2011/35] | Priority number, date | US20020132562 | 25.04.2002 Original published format: US 132562 | [2011/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2361590 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2361590 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/221, A61M25/00, A61M25/09, A61B17/00, A61B17/22, A61F2/01, A61B17/12 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
A61F2/013 (EP,US);
A61B17/12172 (EP,US);
A61B17/221 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61B17/12022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22045 (EP,US);
A61F2002/015 (EP,US);
A61F2002/018 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2230/008 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0093 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0079 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/35] | A61F2/01, A61B17/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2011/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vaskulare Schutzvorrichtungen und Verfahren zu deren Benutzung | [2011/35] | English: | Vascular protection devices and methods of use | [2011/35] | French: | Dispositifs de protection vasculaire et procédés d'utilisation | [2011/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03721893.0 / EP1501401 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2003 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | PT | 29.10.2018 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0135857 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 21, line 4 - line 7 * * figure 4D *; | [X]US6277139 (LEVINSON MELVIN E [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 7, line 44 - line 58 * * figures 1-4B *; | [XP]US2002095174 (TSUGITA ROSS [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * paragraph [0069] * * figures 3A,3B *; | [XP]WO03011185 (MEDTRONIC AVE INC [US]) [XP] 1-15 * page 13, line 11 - line 18 ** figure 5 * | Examination | WO9601591 | WO0115629 | by applicant | WO9601591 | WO0053120 | WO0187183 | EP1181900 | US20020093572 |