EP2466424 - Touch pen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kooner Technology (Taiwan) Co. Ltd. 5F.-1, No.736, Zhongzheng Rd., Zhonghe District New Taipei City 23511 / CN | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shih, Chun-Mei No.374, Gongming Rd., East Dist. Chiayi City 60047 / TW | 02 /
Lu, Yung-Suo Guangxi TianLinXian baise region CunPing JiTun PingTang township flat auspicious / CN | 03 /
Hsu, Chao-Hui No.12, Fuhua St., Yangmei City Taoyuan County 32642 / TW | 04 /
Yu, Liang-Ming No.12 Ln. 32, Sanyuan 3rd St. Daxi Township Taoyuan County 335 / TW | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei Rosenheimer Strasse 139 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/25] | Lang, Christian, et al LangRaible GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rosenheimerstrasse 139 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11164367.2 | 29.04.2011 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | TW20209224173 | 14.12.2010 Original published format: TW 099224173 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2466424 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Touch-Pen | [2012/25] | English: | Touch pen | [2012/25] | French: | Stylo tactile | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 03.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5440080 (NAGAOKA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9740488 (CIRQUE CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US5877459 (PRATER JAMES S [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I]JP2000122799 (PILOT PRECISION) [I] 1-3,6,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2128743 (DELTA ELECTRONICS INC [TW]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [ ] - Nagaoka Toshimasa, "Input Pen (English translation of JP2000122799 A)", National Center for Industrial Property Information and Training, (20000428), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/homepg_e.ipdl, (20110915), XP055007265 [ ] * the whole document * |