|
20.04.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
34 |
|
15.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
34 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
19.02.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.02.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.02.2021 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2021 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.01.2021 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
03.09.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2020 |
Consolidated list of documents cited in appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 002 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.02.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 001 |
Appeal |
38 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
28.03.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.01.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.09.2017 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
22.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2014 |
Request for transfer of rights - opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.05.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
03.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Deficiencies in application documents - annex B |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
09.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
39 |