EP2390618 - Mechanism for setting a fuse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEONARDO S.P.A. Piazza Monte Grappa, 4 00195 Roma / IT | [2016/39] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Oto Melara S.p.A. Via Valdilocchi, 15 19136 La Spezia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiappini, Andrea OTO MELARA S.p.A. c/o OTO MELARA Via Valdilocchi 19136, La Spezia / IT | 02 /
Biselli, Gianluca OTO MELARA S.p.A. c/o OTO MELARA S.p.A. Via Valdil 19136, La Spezia / IT | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Di Gennaro, Sergio Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [2011/48] | Application number, filing date | 11166830.7 | 20.05.2011 | [2011/48] | Priority number, date | IT2010TO00439 | 26.05.2010 Original published format: IT TO20100439 | [2011/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390618 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2390618 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F42C17/00 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
F42C17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2011/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mechanismus zum Einstellen eines Zünders | [2011/48] | English: | Mechanism for setting a fuse | [2011/48] | French: | Mécanisme de réglage d'une fusée | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 30.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2011 | AL | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | IE | 20.05.2017 | LU | 20.05.2017 | MT | 20.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.05.2011 | |
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | IT | 15.03.2017 | |
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
MT | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | IT | 15.03.2017 | |
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | IT | 15.03.2017 | |
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 20.05.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | IT | 15.03.2017 | |
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 20.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | IT | 15.03.2017 | |
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | IT | 15.03.2017 | |
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | IT | 15.03.2017 | |
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/44] | RS | 15.03.2017 | |
LU | 31.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2442842 (COLE FRANK E, et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 11 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 12 * * figure - *; | [A]GB808480 (VALENTINE PEARCE HARVEY, et al) [A] 9 * figure - *; | [A]DE1578509 (TELEFUNKEN PATENT) [A] 10 * figure - *; | [A]CH503254 (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG [CH]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US3710677 (MAYER C) [Y] 1-16 * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 6 * * figures 5-7 * |