|
15.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
02.11.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.05.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2012 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.01.2012 |
Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Invitation to indicate the claims and the subject-matter to be searched |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |