EP2474869 - Method for controlling the distance between the photosensitive member and the developing member in a toner cartridge, and the device thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhuhai Seine Technology Limited No. 63 Mingzhubei Road Xiangzhou District Zhuhai Guangdong / CN | [2014/30] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Zhuhai Seine Technology Limited No. 63 Mingzhubei Road Xiangzhou District Zhuhai Guangdong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Lianjun Zhuhai Seine Technology Limited No. 63, Mingzhubei Road Xiangzhou District Zhuhai Guangdong / CN | 02 /
Peng, Qingfei Zhuhai Seine Technology Limited No. 63, Mingzhubei Road Xiangzhou District Zhuhai Guangdong / CN | 03 /
Cao, Jianxin Zhuhai Seine Technology Limited No. 63, Mingzhubei Road Xiangzhou District Zhuhai Guangdong / CN | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Hellmich, Wolfgang European Patent and Trademark Attorney Lortzingstrasse 9 / 2. Stock 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Hellmich, Wolfgang European Patent and Trademark Attorney Lortzingstrasse 9 / 2. Stock 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/28] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11172102.3 | 10.08.2009 | [2012/28] | Priority number, date | CN200810141943 | 15.08.2008 Original published format: CN200810141943 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474869 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474869 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2474869 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/18 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
G03G15/0813 (EP,US);
G03G21/1821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung der Distanz zwischen dem lichtempfindlichen Element und dem Entwicklungselement in einer Tonerkartusche und Vorrichtung dafür | [2012/28] | English: | Method for controlling the distance between the photosensitive member and the developing member in a toner cartridge, and the device thereof | [2012/28] | French: | Procédé de contrôle de la distance entre l'élément photosensible et l'élément de développement dans une cartouche de toner et dispositif correspondant | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 07.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09167570.2 / EP2161628 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090167570) is 28.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2009 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | IE | 10.08.2014 | LU | 10.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 10.08.2009 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.08.2014 | ||
LU | 10.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 10.08.2009 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 10.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0389267 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [I] 1,3,5 * column 6, line 32 - column 9, line 54; figures 1-7 *; | [I]US5089849 (HIRAOKA SATOSHI [JP]) [I] 1,3,5,7* column 4, line 7 - column 7, line 38; figures 1-11 *; | [X]US2006159487 (CHOI SAM-SEOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0028] , [0029] , [0039] - [0043]; figures 1-5 *; | [I]EP1703341 (CANON KK [JP]) [I] 1,3-5,7 * page 5, line 17 - page 10, line 51; figures 1-6 * |