EP2374706 - Shift control device for a bicycle transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77 Oimatsu-cho, 3-cho, Sakai Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Tatsuya c/o Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2011/46] |
Former [2011/43] | 01 /
Kawakami, Tatsuya 34-502, 1, Ebaraji-cho 1-cho Sakai-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2011/41] | 01 /
Kawakami, Tatsuya 34-502, 1, Ebaraji-cho 1-cho Sakai-shi Osaka, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Grosse, Felix Christopher Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14 80335 München / DE | [2011/41] | Application number, filing date | 11173064.4 | 26.04.2005 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | US20040710610 | 23.07.2004 Original published format: US 710610 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2374706 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2374706 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2374706 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/04, B62K23/06 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
B62M25/04 (EP,US);
B62K23/06 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2011/41] | Title | German: | Steuerungseinrichtung für eine Fahrradgangschaltung | [2011/41] | English: | Shift control device for a bicycle transmission | [2011/41] | French: | Dispositif de commande des changements de vitesses pour bicyclette | [2011/41] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 29.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05009121.4 / EP1619113 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050009121) is 09.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.03.2016 | FR | 30.05.2016 | [2017/26] |
Former [2017/04] | IT | 30.03.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5044213 (NAGANO MASASHI [JP]) [X] 1-11 * column 11, line 5 - line 35 * * figures 1-3, 12-15 *; | [I]US5095768 (NAGANO MASASHI [JP]) [I] 1 * column 6 * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5241878 (NAGANO MASASHI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 14 ** figures 3-9 *; | [XI]EP0768234 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 20 - line 35 * * column 8, line 15 - line 30 * * figures 2-10 * [I] 2-11; | [XI]DE10016581 (SRAM DE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 2,8 * [I] 2-11; | [I]US2002124679 (DAL PRA GIUSEPPE [IT]) [I] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5094120 | US5400675 |