EP2378027 - A set of two identical floor panels with a flexible tongue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/42] | A set of mechanically joinable floor panels with a flexible tongue | ||
[2019/28] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pervan, Darko Bygatan 30 263 61 VIKEN / SE | 02 /
Nygren, Per Surbrunnsgatan 15 253 60 RAMLÖSA / SE | 03 /
Håkansson, Niclas Syllstensgatan 19 263 65 VIKEN / SE | [2011/52] |
Former [2011/42] | 01 /
Pervan, Darko Bygatan 30 263 61 VIKEN / SE | ||
02 /
Nygren, Per S. Brunnsvägen 62 256 54 RAMLÖSA / SE | |||
03 /
Håkansson, Niclas Syllstensgatan 19 263 65 VIKEN / SE | Representative(s) | Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Engstrand, Ola, et al Välinge Innovation AB Patent Department Prästavägen 513 263 65 Viken / SE | ||
Former [2011/42] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 11173133.7 | 21.10.2005 | [2011/42] | Priority number, date | EP20040025167 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: EP 04025167 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2378027 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2378027 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, F16B5/00, B65D69/00, E04G23/00 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP,NO,US);
E04F15/02 (KR);
E04B5/00 (US);
E04F15/00 (KR);
E04F21/22 (EP,US);
F16B5/00 (KR);
E04B1/541 (US);
E04B1/5818 (US);
E04F15/04 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0115 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0138 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0146 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0153 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0176 (EP,US);
E04F2201/023 (EP,US);
E04F2201/042 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0523 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0547 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0576 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0582 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0588 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | E04F15/02, F16B5/00, E04F21/22, E04G23/00, B27M3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/42] | Extension states | HR | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Satz zweier identischer Fussbodenpaneele mit einer flexiblen Feder | [2019/28] | English: | A set of two identical floor panels with a flexible tongue | [2019/28] | French: | Jeu de deux panneaux de plancher identiques avec une languette flexible | [2019/28] |
Former [2011/42] | Satz von mechanisch verbindbaren Fussbodenplatten mit einer flexiblen Feder | ||
Former [2011/42] | A set of mechanically joinable floor panels with a flexible tongue | ||
Former [2011/42] | Jeu de panneaux de plancher verrouillables mécaniquement avec une languette flexible | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 19.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05796804.2 / EP1802827 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0198604 (TARKETT SOMMER AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1* figures 3-5 *; | [Y]WO03016654 (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9,13 * figures 23-25 * * page 18, line 29 - line 32 *; | [YA]WO03083234 (VALINGE ALUMINIUM AB [SE], et al) [Y] 10 * page 25, line 10 - line 15 * * page 40, line 17 - page 41, line 13 * * figures 35b-d * * claims 1,4,9,10 * [A] 12; | [YPA]WO2005054599 (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [YP] 1-10,13 * figures 6a-c * * page 18, line 28 - page 19, line 21 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 2 * [A] 12 | by applicant | WO0248127 | WO03083234 |