EP2420212 - Foot prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states medi prosthetics GmbH Medicusstrasse 1 95448 Bayreuth / DE | [2016/13] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states medi GmbH & Co. KG Medicusstrasse 1 95448 Bayreuth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
* * * | [2012/08] | Representative(s) | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/09] |
Former [2012/08] | Blaumeier, Jörg Lindner Blaumeier Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11175493.3 | 27.07.2011 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | DE20101034893 | 19.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010034893 | [2012/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420212 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2420212 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/09] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2420212 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/66, A61F2/50 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/66 (EP,BR,US);
A61F2002/5003 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5007 (EP,US);
A61F2002/5083 (EP,US);
A61F2002/6621 (EP,US);
A61F2002/6664 (EP,US);
A61F2002/6671 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/08] | A61F2/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2012/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fußprothese | [2012/08] | English: | Foot prosthesis | [2012/08] | French: | Prothèse du pied | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 29.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2011 | AL | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | CZ | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | EE | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | GR | 02.03.2016 | HR | 02.03.2016 | IT | 02.03.2016 | LT | 02.03.2016 | LV | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | MK | 02.03.2016 | MT | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | PL | 02.03.2016 | RO | 02.03.2016 | RS | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | SI | 02.03.2016 | SK | 02.03.2016 | SM | 02.03.2016 | BG | 02.06.2016 | NO | 02.06.2016 | IS | 02.07.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | IE | 27.07.2016 | LU | 27.07.2016 | BE | 31.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
MT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 27.07.2016 | ||
LU | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 02.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
MK | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 27.07.2016 | ||
LU | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
IE | 27.07.2016 | ||
LU | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
MC | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
BG | 02.06.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 02.03.2016 | |
EE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RO | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
SK | 02.03.2016 | ||
SM | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
IS | 02.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
LV | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
RS | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
LT | 02.03.2016 | ||
PL | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
HR | 02.03.2016 | ||
NO | 02.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE4037928 (HMS ANTRIEBSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,13,20 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 49; figures 3,4 * [Y] 21 [I] 4,5; | [YA]WO0230340 (BOCK ORTHOPAED IND [DE], et al) [Y] 21 * page 6, line 5 - line 19; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]US2005038524 (JONSSON ORN INGVI [IS], et al) [A] 1-4,12,13,15 * paragraph [0054]; figures 6a,6b *; | [A]US2008033578 (CHRISTENSEN ROLAND J [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0036]; figure 6 * |