|
05.07.2019 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2019 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
23 |
|
05.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.10.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
24 |
|
09.08.2018 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.09.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.08.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
22.02.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.12.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.10.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.12.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.08.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |