EP2444859 - Cooling device, cooling method, and image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iijima, Yasuaki c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Okano, Satoshi c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Hirasawa, Tomoyasu c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Saitoh, Masanori c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Shingo c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
Ikeda, Keisuke c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
Takehara, Kenichi c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 08 /
Fujiya, Hiromitsu c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 09 /
Yuasa, Keisuke c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/29] |
Former [2012/17] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11180414.2 | 07.09.2011 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | JP20100208426 | 16.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010208426 | JP20110128502 | 08.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011128502 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2444859 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2444859 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444859 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/02, G03G21/20 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G03G21/206 (EP,US);
G03G21/20 (EP,US);
F25D17/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/23] | G03G21/20, F25B1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/17] | G03G21/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | Kühlvorrichtung, Kühlverfahren und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2012/17] | English: | Cooling device, cooling method, and image forming apparatus | [2012/17] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement, procédé de refroidissement et appareil de formation d'images | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 20.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2011 | AL | 17.07.2019 | AT | 17.07.2019 | CY | 17.07.2019 | CZ | 17.07.2019 | DK | 17.07.2019 | EE | 17.07.2019 | ES | 17.07.2019 | FI | 17.07.2019 | HR | 17.07.2019 | IT | 17.07.2019 | LT | 17.07.2019 | LV | 17.07.2019 | MC | 17.07.2019 | MK | 17.07.2019 | MT | 17.07.2019 | NL | 17.07.2019 | PL | 17.07.2019 | RO | 17.07.2019 | RS | 17.07.2019 | SE | 17.07.2019 | SI | 17.07.2019 | SK | 17.07.2019 | SM | 17.07.2019 | TR | 17.07.2019 | IE | 07.09.2019 | LU | 07.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | BG | 17.10.2019 | NO | 17.10.2019 | GR | 18.10.2019 | IS | 17.11.2019 | PT | 18.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.09.2011 | |
AL | 17.07.2019 | ||
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
MT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.09.2019 | ||
LU | 07.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 07.09.2011 | |
AL | 17.07.2019 | ||
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.09.2019 | ||
LU | 07.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.09.2019 | ||
LU | 07.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.09.2019 | ||
LU | 07.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.09.2019 | ||
LU | 07.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 17.07.2019 | |
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 17.07.2019 | |
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 17.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0965737 (SIEMENS CANADA LTD [CA]) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,7-11; | [X]KR20040010483 (HYUN JUN POWTECH CO LTD) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2008116681 (RICOH KK) [Y] 2,3,7,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2009169276 (RICOH KK) [Y] 4,5,9,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2009300852 (RICOH KK) [Y] 11* the whole document * |