EP2430994 - Spinal column stabilization system, connecting element for a spinal column stabilzation system and method of manufacturing such a connecting element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states Aesculap AG Am Aesculap-Platz 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beger, Jens Schlehenweg 7 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 02 /
Hoefer, Fabian Graneggweg 18 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 03 /
Hohl, Berthold Semmelweisstraße 100 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | 04 /
Schmid, Stefan Ahornweg 18 78570 Mühlheim / DE | 05 /
Heine, Josef Semmelweisstraße 1 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/27] |
Former [2012/12] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11181730.0 | 19.09.2011 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | DE20101037665 | 20.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010037665 | DE20101060112 | 21.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010060112 | [2012/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2430994 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2430994 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2430994 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
A61B17/7026 (EP,US);
A61B17/7004 (EP,US);
A61B17/701 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49613 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2012/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Wirbelsäulenstabilisierungssystem, Verbindungselement für ein Wirbelsäulenstabilisierungssystem und Verfahren zum Herstellen eines solchen Verbindungselements | [2012/12] | English: | Spinal column stabilization system, connecting element for a spinal column stabilzation system and method of manufacturing such a connecting element | [2012/12] | French: | Système de stabilisation de la colonne vertébrale, élément de liaison pour un système de stabilisation de la colonne vertébrale et procédé de fabrication d'un tel élément de liaison | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 06.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2011 | AL | 05.07.2017 | CY | 05.07.2017 | CZ | 05.07.2017 | DK | 05.07.2017 | EE | 05.07.2017 | ES | 05.07.2017 | FI | 05.07.2017 | HR | 05.07.2017 | IT | 05.07.2017 | LT | 05.07.2017 | LV | 05.07.2017 | MC | 05.07.2017 | MK | 05.07.2017 | MT | 05.07.2017 | NL | 05.07.2017 | PL | 05.07.2017 | PT | 05.07.2017 | RO | 05.07.2017 | RS | 05.07.2017 | SE | 05.07.2017 | SI | 05.07.2017 | SK | 05.07.2017 | SM | 05.07.2017 | TR | 05.07.2017 | AT | 19.09.2017 | IE | 19.09.2017 | LU | 19.09.2017 | BE | 30.09.2017 | CH | 30.09.2017 | LI | 30.09.2017 | BG | 05.10.2017 | NO | 05.10.2017 | GR | 06.10.2017 | IS | 05.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.09.2011 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PT | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
AT | 19.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.09.2011 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
TR | 05.07.2017 | ||
AT | 19.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.09.2011 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MK | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
AT | 19.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.09.2011 | |
CY | 05.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
AT | 19.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.09.2011 | |
CZ | 05.07.2017 | ||
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
AT | 19.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
AT | 19.09.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
MT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SI | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
BE | 30.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
IE | 19.09.2017 | ||
LU | 19.09.2017 | ||
CH | 30.09.2017 | ||
LI | 30.09.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/26] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
MC | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
IT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
SM | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
EE | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RO | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
SK | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 05.07.2017 | |
DK | 05.07.2017 | ||
ES | 05.07.2017 | ||
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
LV | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 05.07.2017 | |
FI | 05.07.2017 | ||
HR | 05.07.2017 | ||
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
PL | 05.07.2017 | ||
RS | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
BG | 05.10.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
GR | 06.10.2017 | ||
IS | 05.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
SE | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 05.07.2017 | |
LT | 05.07.2017 | ||
NL | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 05.07.2017 | |
NO | 05.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008234736 (TRIEU HAI H [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12 * figures 1-2 * [I] 7,8; | [XDI]US2006184171 (BIEDERMANN LUTZ [DE], et al) [XD] 1,3,5,6,10-12 * figures 6-7,9 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]FR2905847 (WARSAW ORTHOPEDIC INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,10-12 * page 4, line 20 - line 23; figures 1,4 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]WO2009036156 (SYNTHES USA LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10-12 * figure 8 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]WO2010099316 (WARSAW ORTHOPEDIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-12 * page 1, line 30 - line 32 * * page 2, line 11 - line 18 * * page 3, line 8 - line 14 * * page 18, line 14 - line 22; figures 6,17 * * page 21, line 23 - page 23, line 17; figures 44-46 * [I] 7,8; | [XI]US2007191832 (TRIEU HAI H [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-12 * figures 2,6A-C,11A-B,; claims 1,5,10 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0031] , [0036] , [0054] - [0057] * [I] 7,8; | [A]US2006229608 (FOSTER THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1,10,12,13 * paragraph [0055]; figures 2-3 * | by applicant | US2006184171 |