|
08.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2019 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
15.02.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
17.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
01.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2018 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2018 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.11.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.10.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2017 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.07.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
03.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.04.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
04.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.07.2014 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2012 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no processing as European divisional application) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
29 |