EP2405007 - Production of a lipid acyltransferase from transformed Bacillus licheniformis cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/02] | Production of a lipid acyltransferase from transformed bacillus cells | ||
[2013/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DuPont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 Postboks 17 1001 Copenhagen K. / DK | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Dupont Nutrition Biosciences ApS Langebrogade 1 P.O. Box 17 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states Danisco A/S Langebrogade 1 1001 Copenhagen K / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kolkman, Marc Linnaeushof 25 2341 PA Oegstgeest / NL | 02 /
Mikkelsen, Jørn Dalgaard Engkaer 38 2650 Hvidovre / DK | 03 /
Lorentsen, Rikke Høegh Karetmagervej 52 8900 Randers / DK | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11184428.8 | 25.01.2007 | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2405007 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2405007 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/18, C12N9/10, C12N15/75 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C12N15/75 (EP,US);
C12N9/1029 (EP,US);
C12N9/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/02] | C12N15/54, C12N9/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | 11.07.2012 | BA | 11.07.2012 | HR | 11.07.2012 | MK | 11.07.2012 | RS | 11.07.2012 | Title | German: | Herstellung einer Lipid-Acyltransferase aus transformierten Bacillus licheniformis-Zellen | [2013/17] | English: | Production of a lipid acyltransferase from transformed Bacillus licheniformis cells | [2013/17] | French: | Production d'une lipide acyltransferase à partir de cellules transformées de Bacillus licheniformis | [2013/17] |
Former [2012/02] | Hestellung einer Lipid-Acyltransferase aus transformierten Bacillus-Zellen | ||
Former [2012/02] | Production of a lipid acyltransferase from transformed bacillus cells | ||
Former [2012/02] | Production d'une lipide acyltransférase à partir de cellules transformées de bacillus | Examination procedure | 10.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 17.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07705681.0 / EP2109670 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.01.2007 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | LU | 25.01.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | LT | 04.12.2013 | |
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2004064537 (DANISCO [DK], et al) [ID] 7 * page 107 - page 108; figures 30,31; example 3 *; | [I]WO2005066347 (DANISCO [DK], et al) [I] 1-7 * page 111; figures 35,36 *; | [A] - NERLAND A H, "THE NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF THE GENE ENCODING GCAT FROM AEROMONAS SALMONICIDA SSP. SALMONICIDA", JOURNAL OF FISH DISEASES, OXFORD, GB, (19960101), vol. 19, no. 2, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2761.1996.TB00693.X, ISSN 0140-7775, pages 145 - 150, XP008049669 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2761.1996.tb00693.x | by applicant | US2002009518 | US2004091574 | WO2004064537 | WO2004064987 | WO2005066347 | WO2005066351 | WO2006008508 | US6255076 | WO9117243 | WO9845453 | EP1275711 | WO2005089562 | WO2004097012 | US4683202 | EP0583265 | EP0866796 | WO0206457 | EP0752008 | EP1138763 | EP1103606 | US6180406 | WO0134835 | WO0058517 | US6344328 | US6361974 | US3817837 | US3850752 | US3939350 | US3996345 | US4277437 | US4275149 | US4366241 | US4816567 | US2002182734 | WO0214490 | WO2005111203 | - Food Chemical Codex(3rd Ed.,, (1981), pages 492 - 493 | - BRUMLIK, BUCKLEY, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199604), vol. 178, no. 7, pages 2060 - 2064 | - BEUCAGE S.L. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, pages 1859 - 1869 | - MATTHES ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, pages 801 - 805 | - SAIKI R K ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 487 - 491 | - CARUTHERS MH, NUC ACIDS RES SYMP SER, (1980), pages 215 - 23 | - HORN T, NUC ACIDS RES SYMP SER, (1980), pages 225 - 232 | - MORINAGA ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1984), vol. 2, pages 646 - 649 | - NELSON, LONG, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 180, pages 147 - 151 | - HILTON, BUCKLEY, J BIOL. CHEM., (19910115), vol. 266, no. 2, pages 997 - 1000 | - ROBERTSON, J. BIOL. CHEM., (19940121), vol. 269, no. 3, pages 2146 - 50 | - BRUMLIK ET AL., J. BACTERIOL, (199604), vol. 178, no. 7, pages 2060 - 4 | - PEELMAN, PROTEIN SCI., (199803), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 587 - 99 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), pages 403 - 410 | - FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1999), vol. 174, no. 2, pages 247 - 50 | - FEMS MICROBIOL LETT, (1999), vol. 177, no. 1, pages 187 - 8 | - HIGGINS DG, SHARP PM, GENE, (1988), vol. 73, no. 1, pages 237 - 244 | - SIMON RJ ET AL., PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, no. 20, pages 9367 - 9371 | - HORWELL DC, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1995), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 132 - 134 | - "Guide to Molecular Cloning Techniques", BERGER, KIMMEL, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 152 | - CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (1995), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 501 - 6 | US20060764430 |