EP2584068 - Coating, coating layer system, coated superalloy component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Xin-Hai Höstvindsvägen 8 58272 Linköping / SE | [2013/17] | Application number, filing date | 11185990.6 | 20.10.2011 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2584068 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, C23C30/00 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C22C19/00 (EP,US);
F01D25/005 (US);
B32B15/04 (US);
C22C19/03 (EP,US);
C22C19/055 (EP,US);
C22C19/056 (EP,US);
C22C19/07 (EP,US);
C22C30/00 (EP,US);
C23C28/00 (EP,US);
C23C28/022 (US);
C23C28/3215 (EP,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US);
Y10T428/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12618 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12667 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12861 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12931 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12937 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12979 (EP,US);
Y10T428/264 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beschichtung, Beschichtungsschichtsystem, beschichtete Superlegierungskomponente | [2013/17] | English: | Coating, coating layer system, coated superalloy component | [2013/17] | French: | Revêtement, système de couche de revêtement, composant de superalliage revêtu | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1783236 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3-12 * paragraph [0018]; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2145969 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,3-12 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2006025865 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3-12 * claims 4-8 * | by applicant | - NIJDAM TJ, SLOOF WG, ACTA MATERIA/IA, (2007), vol. 55, page 5980 |