EP2466284 - Force sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wade, Richard HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11193330.5 | 13.12.2011 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | US20100969426 | 15.12.2010 Original published format: US 969426 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2466284 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/22, G01L1/26, G01L1/18 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
G01L1/2231 (EP,US);
G01L1/18 (EP,US);
G01L1/26 (EP,US);
H01L23/04 (EP,US);
H01L2224/291 (EP,US);
H01L2224/2919 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48195 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83805 (EP,US);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07802 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/291, H01L2924/014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/07802, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kraftsensor | [2012/25] | English: | Force sensor | [2012/25] | French: | Capteur de force | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 12.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2012 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5760313 (GUENTNER RONALD E [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 5, lines 7-34; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US6489668 (ODA ZENZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]US2007251328 (SELVAN THIRUMANI A [IN], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0015] , [0030] , [0032] , [0036] , [0043]; figures 2-5 * |