EP2604444 - Method of decorating a surface with discrete units of colored adhesive film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/25] | Method of making a graphic comprised of prespaced graphic elements | ||
[2015/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loescher, Claus 3M Deutschland GmbH Carl-Schurz-Str. 1 41453 Neuss / DE | 02 /
Dannewitz, Viktor 3M Deutschland GmbH Carl-Schurz-Str. 1 41453 Neuss / DE | 03 /
Krybus, Kirstin 3M Deutschland GmbH Carl-Schurz-Str. 1 41453 Neuss / DE | 04 /
Kolowrot, Dirk 3M Deutschland GmbH Carl-Schurz-Str. 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [2015/42] |
Former [2014/20] | Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne, et al 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2013/25] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 11193677.9 | 15.12.2011 | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2604444 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2604444 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B44C1/17, B32B27/00, C09J7/02 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
B44C1/1725 (EP,US);
B44C1/17 (US);
B32B37/12 (US);
C09J7/24 (EP,US);
C09J7/50 (EP,US);
B32B2327/06 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
C08L61/28 (EP,US);
C09J2427/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2013/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Dekorieren einer Oberfläche mit selbstklebenden Farbfolienelementen | [2015/12] | English: | Method of decorating a surface with discrete units of colored adhesive film | [2015/12] | French: | Procédé de décoration d'une surface avec des éléments adhesifs colorés | [2015/12] |
Former [2013/25] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Grafik bestehend aus vorher mit einem Abstand versehenen grafischen Elementen | ||
Former [2013/25] | Method of making a graphic comprised of prespaced graphic elements | ||
Former [2013/25] | Procédé de fabrication d'un graphique comportant des éléments graphiques pré-espacés | Examination procedure | 10.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 27.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2011 | AL | 14.10.2015 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | MT | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | RS | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | SM | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | IE | 15.12.2015 | LU | 15.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | GB | 14.01.2016 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 15.12.2011 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3220886 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * page 2, line 1 - page 8, line 17 *; | [Y]GB2187023 (GERBER SCIENT PRODUCTS INC) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 7 - page 1, line 82 *; | [A]EP0503738 (BOOTSMA TECH BV [NL]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [Y]US5160778 (HASHIMOTO SADAAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 10 - column 6, line 68 *; | [A]US5518786 (JOHNSON JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 15 - column 14, line 55 *; | [YDA]EP0951518 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [YD] 8 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0078] * [A] 1-7,9-12; | [Y]WO02072348 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 1 - page 13, line 27 * * page 17, line 5 - page 19, line 16 * | by applicant | US2736721 | USRE24906E | US4181752 | US4418120 | US4833179 | US4968562 | US4994322 | US5141790 | US5209971 | EP0570515 | US5296277 | EP0617708 | US5362516 | WO9513331 | US5461134 | WO9601687 | EP0951518 | US2008299346 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1988), vol. 13 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Scieinced and Engineering, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 13 |