|
27.11.2020 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Communication about missing proof of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
30.03.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
23.03.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.12.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.06.2012 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2012 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Information relating to the filing of a voluntary divisional application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
07.06.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |