EP2574953 - Method for providing remote health monitoring data and associated system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dévényi, Csaba Viador u. 15 1034 Budapest / HU | 02 /
Kósa, István Egyetem u. 10 8200 Veszprém / HU | 03 /
Lohner, Roland Villányi út 56 1113 Budapest / HU | 04 /
Végsö, Balázs Egyetem u. 10 8200 Veszprém / HU | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Mak, Andras S.B.G. & K. Patent and Law Offices Andrassy ut 113. 1062 Budapest / HU | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Mak, Andras S.B.G. & K. Patent and Law Offices Andrassy ut 113. 1062 Budapest / HU | Application number, filing date | 11462016.4 | 30.09.2011 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574953 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G06F19/00, A61B5/11, // A61B5/145 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,US);
A61B5/318 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A61B5/002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Ferngesundheitsüberwachungsdaten und zugehöriges System | [2013/14] | English: | Method for providing remote health monitoring data and associated system | [2013/14] | French: | Procédé de fourniture de données de surveillance de la santé à distance et système associé | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6524239 (REED WILLIAM C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11,14-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004073093 (HATLESTAD JOHN [US]) [X] 1-3,8-11,13-16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004049916 (AT HOME CARE PARTNERS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11,14-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1504716 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,9-12,14-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007123754 (CUDDIHY PAUL E [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2009171166 (AMUNDSON SCOTT [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US7684999 |