|
21.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
23 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
23 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
23 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
13.10.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.07.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.07.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.05.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.03.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
68 |
|
10.01.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.11.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
19.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.04.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.08.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
06.03.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
19.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
28 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |