EP2553284 - METHOD FOR ADAPTING AN ELECTRICAL RESISTANCE VALUE OF A MAGNETIC BEARING AND FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF AN OBJECT MOUNTED IN A MAGNETIC BEARING IN A SENSORLESS MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLÜCK, Tobias Höglmüllergasse 4b A-1050 Wien / AT | 02 /
BACHMANN, Christian Heimeranstr. 52 80339 München / DE | 03 /
BACHMAIER, Georg Kohlstraße 2 80469 München / DE | 04 /
BERGMANN, Dominik Holzkirchner Straße 21 83679 Sachsenkam / DE | 05 /
KEMMETMÜLLER, Wolfgang An der Niederhaid 37A A-1140 Wien / AT | 06 /
KUGI, Andreas Hetzgasse 45 A-1030 Wien / AT | [2013/07] |
Former [2013/06] | 01 /
GLÜCK, Tobias Höglmüllergasse 4b A-1050 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
BACHMANN, Christian Heimeranstr. 52 80339 München / DE | |||
03 /
BACHMAIER, Georg Kohlstraße 2 80469 München / DE | |||
04 /
BERGMANN, Dominik Holzkirchner Straße 21 83679 Sachsenkam / DE | |||
05 /
KEMMETMÜLLER, Wolfgang Wagramerstr. 4/210 A-1220 Wien / AT | |||
06 /
KUGI, Andreas Hetzgasse 45 A-1030 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/06] | Wolff, Harry Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11710444.8 | 08.03.2011 | WO2011EP53423 | Priority number, date | DE20101013682 | 01.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010013682 | [2013/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011120764 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553284 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/04 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
F16C32/0451 (EP,KR,US);
F16C32/0448 (EP,KR,US);
F16C32/0457 (EP,KR,US);
F16C39/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ADAPTION EINES ELEKTRISCHEN WIDERSTANDSWERTES EINES MAGNETLAGERS UND ZUR SENSORLOSEN POSITIONSERMITTLUNG EINES IM MAGNETLAGER GELAGERTEN OBJEKTS | [2013/06] | English: | METHOD FOR ADAPTING AN ELECTRICAL RESISTANCE VALUE OF A MAGNETIC BEARING AND FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF AN OBJECT MOUNTED IN A MAGNETIC BEARING IN A SENSORLESS MANNER | [2013/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ADAPTATION D'UNE VALEUR DE RÉSISTANCE ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN PALIER MAGNÉTIQUE ET DE DÉTERMINATION SANS CAPTEUR DE LA POSITION D'UN OBJET LOGÉ DANS LE PALIER MAGNÉTIQUE | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1903228 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0024] , [0026] , [0027] , [0032] , [0038] , [0040] , [0041] , [0047] , [0055] - [0057]; figure 1 *; | [ADP]DE102008064380 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [ADP] 1,5 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102008064380 |