|
10.12.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
10.12.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2021 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.2021 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2021 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.12.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
17.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
07.07.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2020 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2020 |
Standard Communication Rule 103 (2) EPC |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
27 |
|
14.09.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
53 |
|
13.07.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.04.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
14.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2013 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
19.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.11.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
11.07.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
24 |
|
04.04.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
14 |