|
03.12.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.10.2020 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.10.2020 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2020 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
22.09.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2020 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.09.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2020 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.09.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.02.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.01.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.11.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
46 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.10.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
12.09.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.09.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.09.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.09.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
20.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Invitation to pay prescribed fees together with late payment fee (Rule 58bis PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.01.2012 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
20.12.2011 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
20.12.2011 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.11.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
11 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |