EP2563223 - LANCING DEVICE WITH AUTOMATIC DISENGAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/10] | LANCING DEVICE HAVING AUTOMATIC TRIGGERING | ||
[2013/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEIL, Michael Hambacher Strasse 8 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | [2013/10] | Application number, filing date | 11717947.3 | 26.04.2011 | WO2011EP02083 | Priority number, date | EP20100004578 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: EP 10004578 | [2013/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011134639 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563223 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563223 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/151 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/15163 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150519 (EP,US);
A61B5/15111 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECHHILFE MIT AUTOMATISCHER AUSLÖSUNG | [2013/10] | English: | LANCING DEVICE WITH AUTOMATIC DISENGAGEMENT | [2014/07] | French: | AIDE À LA PLANTATION DOTÉE D'UN DÉCLENCHEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/10] | LANCING DEVICE HAVING AUTOMATIC TRIGGERING | ||
Former [2013/10] | ACCESSOIRE DE PIQÛRE À DÉCLENCHEMENT AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 23.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2011 | AL | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | RS | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | NO | 25.09.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MK | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 26.04.2011 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XDY]US6986777 (KIM YONG PIL [KR]) [XD] 1,2,6,7,10,12,14,15 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 27 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 3-5,8,9,11,13; | [YDA]EP1034740 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]) [YD] 3-5,8,9,13 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0028] * * figure - * [A] 1,2,6,7,12,14,15; | [YA]EP2033577 (IZUMI COSMO CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 11 * figures 10-16 * [A] 1-10,12-15; | [ID]EP1384438 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [ID] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0042] * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]EP1504718 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0034] , [0038] * * figure - *; | [A]WO2008145625 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * figures 4,5 * * page 17, lines 19-29 *; | [A]WO0236010 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * figures 9A-9C * * page 16, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US2003050656 (SCHRAGA STEVEN [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | EP0668049 | US2008195132 | WO03073936 | WO0205872 | US6986777 | EP1384438 | EP1263320 | EP0565970 | WO0236010 | EP1034740 | US5318584 |