EP2566672 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING ELASTOMERS AND ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brown, Gary 6625 Riverview Line Chatham, Ontario N7M 5T1 / CA | For all designated states Fay, Clifford C. 643 Charles Avenue Kingston, Pennsylvania 18704 / US | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [2018/28] |
Former [2013/11] | Serjeants LLP 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 11720658.1 | 04.05.2011 | [2018/28] | WO2011US35226 | Priority number, date | US20100331105P | 04.05.2010 Original published format: US 331105 P | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011140244 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566672 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2566672 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29B17/00, C08J3/22, C08J11/04 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
C08K5/11 (EP,US);
B29B17/0026 (EP,US);
C08J3/203 (EP,US);
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08J3/28 (US);
C08K3/34 (US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08L19/003 (EP,US);
C08L9/06 (US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
C08J2321/00 (EP,US);
C08J2421/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K5/548 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
Y02W30/62 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/09, C08L19/003 (EP,US);
C08K5/09, C08L21/00 (US,EP);
C08L19/003, C08L2666/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON ELASTOMEREN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE GEGENSTÄNDE | [2018/04] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TREATING ELASTOMERS AND ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM | [2013/11] | French: | MÉTHODE ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D' ÉLASTOMÈRES ET ARTICLES AINSI FABRIQUÉS | [2018/04] |
Former [2013/11] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ELASTOMEREN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER ARTIKEL | ||
Former [2013/11] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR TRAITER DES ÉLASTOMÈRES ET ARTICLES FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 19.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2011 | AL | 11.07.2018 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | MT | 11.07.2018 | NL | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | PT | 11.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 04.05.2011 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
MT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.05.2011 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | |
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 11.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS59124829 ; | [XD]US3873482 (SEVERSON RAY F, et al) [XD] 31-34 * claim - *; | [XDI]US5488080 (OSBORN JOHN D [US]) [XD] 1-25,27-34,36 * the whole document * [I] 26,35; | [XDI]US2001004649 (OSBORN JOHN D [US]) [XD] 1-25,27-34,36 * the whole document * [I] 26,35; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 35, Database accession no. 1984-215736, XP002657912 & JPS59124829 A 19840719 (MITSUI PETROCHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 31-34 * abstract * | by applicant | US3873482 | US4244841 | US4481335 | US4579871 | US4792589 | US4895911 | US5488080 | US5604277 | US2001004649 | US6310126 | US6346561 | US6527430 | US2003204002 | US6924319 | US6924320 | US7342052 | US20110331105 |