EP2601391 - EQUALIZING CONTAINER FOR A COOLANT CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Uwe Siedlungsstr. 18 85134 Stammham / DE | 02 /
ANZENBERGER, Thomas Rothenturmerstr. 76 85053 Ingolstadt / DE | [2013/24] | Application number, filing date | 11733800.4 | 15.07.2011 | WO2011EP03528 | Priority number, date | DE20101033715 | 07.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010033715 | [2013/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012019686 | Date: | 16.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2601391 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2601391 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01P11/02 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
F01P11/0238 (EP,US);
F01P9/00 (KR);
F16K24/04 (US);
F01P11/02 (KR);
F01P11/029 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3084 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGLEICHSBEHÄLTER FÜR EINEN KÜHLMITTELKREISLAUF | [2013/24] | English: | EQUALIZING CONTAINER FOR A COOLANT CIRCUIT | [2013/24] | French: | RÉCIPIENT DE COMPENSATION POUR UN CIRCUIT DE LIQUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2013/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 14.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2011 | AL | 21.05.2014 | BG | 21.05.2014 | CY | 21.05.2014 | CZ | 21.05.2014 | DK | 21.05.2014 | EE | 21.05.2014 | FI | 21.05.2014 | HR | 21.05.2014 | LT | 21.05.2014 | LV | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | MK | 21.05.2014 | MT | 21.05.2014 | NL | 21.05.2014 | PL | 21.05.2014 | RO | 21.05.2014 | RS | 21.05.2014 | SE | 21.05.2014 | SI | 21.05.2014 | SK | 21.05.2014 | SM | 21.05.2014 | TR | 21.05.2014 | IE | 15.07.2014 | LU | 15.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | NO | 21.08.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | IS | 21.09.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | [2023/35] |
Former [2019/11] | HU | 15.07.2011 | |
AL | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MK | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 15.07.2011 | |
AL | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MK | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.07.2011 | |
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MK | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.07.2011 | |
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.07.2011 | |
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 21.05.2014 | |
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 21.05.2014 | |
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 15.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 21.05.2014 | |
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | DK | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RS | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 21.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6129021U (---) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4025067 (MERCEDES-BENZ-AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 30 - line 38; figure 1 *; | [A]US3077927 (WHITE THEODORE Z, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 2, lines 23-47; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE4039993 |