EP2531906 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADJUSTING A PARAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAURANEN, Eero Matti Juhani Tukkikatu 14 FIN-24280 Salo / FI | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Scott David, et al Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/50] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department PO Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 11736700.3 | 01.02.2011 | WO2011IB50442 | Priority number, date | US20100698016 | 01.02.2010 Original published format: US 698016 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011092677 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531906 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0484, G06F3/0488, // G06F3/0485 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
G06F3/04847 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F3/04855 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINES PARAMETERS | [2012/50] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ADJUSTING A PARAMETER | [2012/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR REGLER UN PARAMETRE | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 18.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6429846 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al) [A] 10 * figure 8 ** column 12, line 50 - column 13, line 5 *; | [XI]WO2008025370 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,11-15 * figures 4,8 * * page 21, line 7 - page 23, line 8 * [I] 4,5,10; | [XI]US2008204477 (VENOLIA DANIEL SCOTT [US]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,15 * figures 5,6A,6B * * paragraphs [0036] , [0044] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0071] * * claims 1-6 * [I] 10,13; | [XI] - HÜRST W ET AL, "Interactive video browsing on mobile devices", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA 2007, (20070924), doi:10.1145/1291233.1291284, ISBN 978-1-59593-702-5, pages 247 - 256, XP008109270 [X] 1-3,6-9,11,12,14,15 * figure 3 * * sec. 3.1 * * sec. 3.3, par. 6 * [I] 4,5,10,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1291233.1291284 | International search | [A]US2003222925 (REGELOUS STEPHEN J [NZ]); | [A]WO2007113635 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]WO2009069049 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [AP]US2010162181 (SHIPLACOFF DANIEL MARC GATAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US2008204477 | - WOLFGANG HIIRST; GEORG GOTZ; MARTINA WELTE, "Interactive Video Browsing on Mobile Devices", PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIFTEENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTI-MEDIA 2007, (20070924), doi:doi:10.1145/1291233.1291284, pages 247 - 256, XP008109270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1291233.1291284 |