EP2531255 - ANGIOCATHETER DEVICE WITH IMPROVED SAFETY FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spurbeck, William Paul 10393 E. Avalon Park Tucson, AZ 85747 / US | For all designated states Banister, Mark 6550 E. Miramar Drive Tucson, AZ 85715 / US | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Carsten Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Beyer Kaiserring 48 68161 Mannheim / DE | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 11737633.5 | 27.01.2011 | WO2011US22707 | Priority number, date | US20100406016P | 22.10.2010 Original published format: US 406016 P | US20100337155P | 01.02.2010 Original published format: US 337155 P | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011094397 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531255 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/04 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
A61M25/0606 (EP,US);
A61M25/0097 (EP,US);
A61M25/0693 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | 31.07.2012 | ME | 31.07.2012 | Title | German: | ANGIOKATHETERVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTEN SICHERHEITSFUNKTIONEN | [2012/50] | English: | ANGIOCATHETER DEVICE WITH IMPROVED SAFETY FEATURES | [2012/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANGIO-CATHÉTER PRÉSENTANT DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE SÉCURITÉ AMELIORÉES | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 03.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0451040 (PARKER ROBERT L [US], et al); | [Y]US5700248 (LOPEZ GEORGE A [US]); | [Y]US5832971 (YALE MARK C [US], et al); | [Y]US7037292 (CARLYON JAMES L [US], et al) |