|
25.11.2022 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.12.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.2021 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (proprietor) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2021 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (proprietor) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Communication about missing proof of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2020 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.05.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
14.04.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2020 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2016 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
18.08.2011 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
68 |