EP2537954 - HOT-DIPPED STEEL MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumikin Coated Sheet Corporation 1-5-6, Nihombashi-homchou Chuou-ku Tokyo 1030023 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2017/44] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Nippon Steel&Sumikin Coated Sheet Corporation 1-5-6, Nihombashi-homchou Chuou-ku Tokyo 1030023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | |||
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Nippon Steel&Sumikin Coated Sheet Corporation 1-5-6, Nihombashi-homchou Chuou-ku Tokyo 1030023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Shiro c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Coated Sheet Corporation 9-2, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | 02 /
YAMANAKA, Yoshikazu c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Coated Sheet Corporation 9-2, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | 03 /
SHIRAGAKI, Nobuki c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Coated Sheet Corporation 9-2, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | 04 /
KANAI, Hiroshi c/o Nippon Steel&Sumikin Coated Sheet Corporation 9-2, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | 05 /
SHIMODA, Nobuyuki c/o Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 06 /
MORIMOTO, Yasuhide c/o Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 07 /
SUEMUNE, Yoshihiro c/o Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 08 /
OOHASHI, Tooru c/o Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2012/52] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11744720.1 | 17.02.2011 | [2017/44] | WO2011JP53426 | Priority number, date | JP20100033502 | 18.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010033502 | [2012/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011102434 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537954 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2537954 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/06, C23C2/12, B05D1/18 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
C23C2/06 (EP,KR,US);
B05D1/18 (US);
C23C2/12 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/16 (KR);
C23C2/50 (KR);
C23C28/021 (KR,US);
C23C28/023 (KR,US);
C23C30/00 (US);
C23C30/005 (KR,US);
Y10T428/12757 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12764 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12799 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12924 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12972 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12979 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/52] | C23C2/06, C23C2/02, C23C2/12, C23C2/16, C23C2/26, C23C28/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEUERVEREDELTES STAHLMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2012/52] | English: | HOT-DIPPED STEEL MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2012/52] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ACIER MÉTALLISÉ PAR IMMERSION, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2012 | Translation filed | 11.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 15.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2011 | AL | 01.11.2017 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | RS | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IE | 17.02.2018 | LU | 17.02.2018 | MT | 17.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
MT | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4897124 (MATSUO MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 15 * figure 3 *; | [A]JP2996251B (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD; SKY ALUMINIUM) [A] 9,12,15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000328214 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 10* paragraph [0022] *; | [A]EP1193323 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0019]; claims 3,4,8,14 *; | [XI]EP1225246 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-12,14 * the whole document * [I] 13,15; | [XI]JP2007284718 (JFE GALVANIZING & COATING CO) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [I] 9-15 | International search | [A]JPH09316618 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [X]JP2000328214 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) |