EP2612447 - SECURING OF A TELECOMMUNICATION DEVICE INCLUDING A NEAR-FIELD COMMUNICATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proton World International N.V. Lambroekstraat 5B 1831 Diegem / BE | [2016/08] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states Proton World International N.V. Excelsiorlaan 44-46 1930 Zawentem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INGELS, Didier 16 Rue de Perwez B-1367 Grand-Rosiere / BE | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Thibon, Laurent Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Thibon, Laurent Cabinet Beaumont 1, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 11748662.1 | 25.08.2011 | [2016/27] | WO2011EP64643 | Priority number, date | FR20100056913 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: FR 1056913 | [2013/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012028532 | Date: | 08.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612447 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2612447 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, H04M1/23 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
H04B5/72 (EP,US);
H04B5/79 (EP,US);
H04M1/23 (EP,US);
H04M2250/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/28] | H04B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERUNG EINER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM NAHFELDKOMMUNIKATIONSMODUL | [2016/19] | English: | SECURING OF A TELECOMMUNICATION DEVICE INCLUDING A NEAR-FIELD COMMUNICATION MODULE | [2013/28] | French: | SÉCURISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION ÉQUIPÉ D'UN MODULE DE COMMUNICATION EN CHAMP PROCHE | [2016/20] |
Former [2013/28] | BEFESTIGUNG EINER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM NAHFELDKOMMUNIKATIONSMODUL | ||
Former [2013/28] | SECURISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TELECOMMUNICATION EQUIPE D'UN MODULE DE COMMUNICATION EN CHAMP PROCHE | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 11.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2011 | AL | 06.07.2016 | AT | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | MT | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | IE | 25.08.2016 | LU | 25.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | GB | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 25.08.2016 | ||
LU | 25.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GB | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 25.08.2016 | ||
LU | 25.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GB | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.08.2011 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 25.08.2016 | ||
LU | 25.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GB | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 25.08.2016 | ||
LU | 25.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GB | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 25.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GB | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
IE | 25.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2004232220 (BEENAU BLAYN W [US], et al); | [A]EP1928099 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP2034705 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2921786 (SMART CARD LAB INC [KR]); | [A]FR2942365 (ST MICROELECTRONICS ROUSSET [FR]); |